Dineen, Sarah Marie (CPSO#: 98242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Fernandez, Sarah Marie (used until: 18 Nov 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Department of Pediatrics
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Paediatrics
1260 Golf Links Road, Suite 104
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Canada
Phone: 807-766-3370
Fax: 807-766-3374
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH MARIE DINEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017