skip to content

Din, Shamoon Hasham

CPSO#: 92234

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2014
EXPIRY DATE
28 Feb 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Spanish, Urdu

Education:Grace University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shamoon Din Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2014