skip to content

Dilworth, Neil Michael

CPSO#: 90252

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Mar 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Ann Dr.
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dilworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dilworth ( CPSO# 90252 )

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
150 Eglinton Avenue East
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M4P 1E8
Phone Number: (416) 481-1601

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
South Huron Hospital Exeter

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEIL MICHAEL DILWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DILWORTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 24 May 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 May 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2011