First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 1996 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 1996 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 1996 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 17 Apr 1997 |
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 1998 |
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 19 Mar 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |