skip to content

Dighe, Kushal Jagdish

CPSO#: 85256

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Mumbai, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4440 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON  N8W 1K5
Phone: 519 916 0993
Fax: 519 916 0994 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kushal Dighe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dighe ( CPSO# 85256 )

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Windsor Heart Institute
2464 Howard Avenue
Suite 201
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 977-6643

Business Address:
4440 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON  N8W 1K5
Phone Number: 519 9160993

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KUSHAL JAGDISH DIGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIGHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
AVP - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009