skip to content

Dighe, Krupa Hasmukh

CPSO#: 85298

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Mali, Krupa Hasmukh (used until: 13 Jun 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Mumbai, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4440 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON  N8W 1K5
Phone: 519 916 0993
Fax: 519 916 0994 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Regional Hospital
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: 519-973-4411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Krupa Dighe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dighe ( CPSO# 85298 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (647) 971-8146

Business Address:
201 - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (647) 971-8146

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (647) 971-8146

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRUPA HASMUKH DIGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIGHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
AVP - Internal Medicine

Western University, 09 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

Western University, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012