skip to content

Didomizio, Laura Jane

CPSO#: 97056

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Ave South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: 905-683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-3331
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. L. Didomizio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Didomizio ( CPSO# 97056 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster University Medical Centre Medical Records Dept MUMC Site Phone#: 905-521-2100 ext 75111
Date Received: 29 Aug 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA JANE DIDOMIZIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIDOMIZIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2011 to 23 Dec 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 28 Feb 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014