Dibildox Gonzalez, Manuel (CPSO#: 96280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Escuela De Medicina Ignacio A.Santos, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 8N
585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5T 2C4
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manuel Dibildox Gonzalez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dibildox Gonzalez ( CPSO# 96280 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 8N
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2C4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Manuel  Dibidox  Gonzalez  may  practise medicine independently in general
            surgery and critical care medicine, only.