Diab, Sehriban (CPSO#: 98515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Turkish

Education:National University of Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1144 Wilson St W
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone: 289-445-1071
Fax: 289-855-2838
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEHRIBAN DIAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2016