skip to content

DiTullio, Sonia Maria

CPSO#: 88115

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: Vaithilingam, Sonia Maria (used until: 09 Mar 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Ross Ave East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 360-0659
Fax: 705-412-4198 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sonia DiTullio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. DiTullio ( CPSO# 88115 )

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SONIA MARIA DITULLIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DITULLIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 10 Mar 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 02 Jun 2008 to 09 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 10 Mar 2009 to 09 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010