skip to content

DiMeo, Michael

CPSO#: 96237

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakehead University
Student Health & Counselling Centre
955 Oliver Rd, Prettie Building
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone: 807-343-8361
Fax: 807-346-7740 Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DIMEO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIMEO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2014