skip to content

Di Ieva, Antonio

CPSO#: 97103

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Naples, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2011 to 08 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014