skip to content

Di Guglielmo, Federico

CPSO#: 96699

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2012