Dhotar, Herman Singh (CPSO#: 90463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Ross University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 243
1333 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 492-5633
Fax: (416) 495-1590
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Herman S. Dhotar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dhotar ( CPSO# 90463 )

Business Address:
243 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 492-5633

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERMAN SINGH DHOTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHOTAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2014