skip to content

Dholasania, Rozina Nazarali

CPSO#: 89808

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Empire medical clinic
Suite G125
520 Ellesemere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: 416-673-9191
Fax: 416-673-9193 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

One Care Medical Clinic
1755 Brimley Road
Scarborough ON  M1P0A3
Canada
Phone: 416-290-0361
Fax: 416-290-5986
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dholasania Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dholasania ( CPSO# 89808 )

Business Address:
One Care Medical Clinic
1755 Brimley Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 0A3
Phone Number: (416) 290-0361

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROZINA NAZARALI DHOLASANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHOLASANIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2011 to 13 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2011