skip to content

Dhillon, Sukhjeet Kaur

CPSO#: 99050

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr. E
Brampton ON  L6R 3S7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 50801 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

82 Buttonwood Avenue
York ON  M6M 2J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 243-3600
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sukhjeet Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dhillon ( CPSO# 99050 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
82 Buttonwood Avenue
York ON  M6M 2J5
Phone Number: (416) 243-3600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUKHJEET KAUR DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2012

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 10, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)