skip to content

Dhillon, Rupinder Singh

CPSO#: 88404

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
iHealth Centre
6175 Hwy 7, Units 17, 20
`
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone: 416-297-8362
Fax: 416-840-8434 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Wellness Centre
Etobicoke Renal Centre
3rd floor
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 416-747-3400 Ext. 32484
Fax: 416-747-3052
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

20 Lynch St
Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated
Hemodialysis Unit
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120 Ext. 22565
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Hemodialysis Unit
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120 Ext. 56580
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R.S. Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2016
Corporation Name: Dr. R.S. Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dhillon ( CPSO# 88404 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
6175 HWY 7
Units 17, 20
Vaughan ON  L6H 0P6
Phone Number: (416) 297-8362


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:30 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUPINDER SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2008 to 31 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jun 2009 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 15 Dec 2010 to 14 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014