skip to content

Dhillon, Karamvir Kaur

CPSO#: 90256

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Pune, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th Floor
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B8
Phone: (905) 721-6159
Fax: (905) 721-6619 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dhillon ( CPSO# 90256 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-6159

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KARAMVIR KAUR DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010