skip to content

Dhillon, Anureet Kaur

CPSO#: 85510

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 113
4515 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7
Phone: (905) 794-4088
Fax: (905) 794-4259 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anureet Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhillon ( CPSO# 85510 )

Business Address:
Unit 113
4515 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7
Phone Number: (905) 794-4088

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANUREET KAUR DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 24 Aug 2006 to 20 Sep 2006
EL - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007