skip to content

Dharmai, Gillian Sabrina

CPSO#: 95077

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
377 Church Street, Unit 301
Markham, ON
Markham ON  L6B1A1
Phone: 9055541040
Fax: 9055541041 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gillian Dharmai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dharmai ( CPSO# 95077 )

Business Address:
301 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 554-1040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GILLIAN SABRINA DHARMAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHARMAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016