Dhanoa, Harjeet Singh (CPSO#: 99487)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Mangalore University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Palermo Professional Centre
Suite 190
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (289) 837-0222
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9985
Mc Vean Drive
Brampton
L6POK4
Brampton ON  L6P 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 7948844
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harjeet Dhanoa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dhanoa ( CPSO# 99487 )

Business Address:
Palermo Professional Centre
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 190
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (289) 837-0222

Business Address:
9985 McVean Drive
Suite 4
Brampton ON  L6P 0K4
Phone Number: (289) 837-0222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARJEET SINGH DHANOA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANOA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2014