Dhamko, Helena (CPSO#: 98381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital 7NU
Division of Hematology
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4205
Fax: 416-340-3590
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dhamko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dhamko ( CPSO# 98381 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Room 2 084 Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4205

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 09 Nov 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELENA DHAMKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHAMKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016