skip to content

Dhaliwal, Shelinderjit

CPSO#: 97857

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Dec 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjabi University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Oakville Traflgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 4900
Fax: 9058155076 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 494-6775
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shelinderjit Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dhaliwal ( CPSO# 97857 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6H 0A7
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 Dec 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:17 Dec 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHELINDERJIT DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 17 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 17 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 17 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 16 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017