skip to content

Dhaliwal, Ravinder Singh

CPSO#: 96257

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Non-Binary

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nipigon District Family Health Team
123 Hogan ave
Thunder Bay ON  P0T 2J0
Phone: 807-887-5252 Ext. 230
Fax: 807-887-1645 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dhaliwal ( CPSO# 96257 )

Business Address:
Nipigon District Family Health Team
123 Hogan
Nipigon ON  P0T 2J0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Sep 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAVINDER SINGH DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2012