skip to content

Dhaliwal, Jaskaren Kaur

CPSO#: 90521

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Mann, Jaskaren Kaur (used until: 29 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
456 Vodden St. East
Brampton ON  L6S 5Y7
Phone: 905 497 8155
Fax: 905 497 8955 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jaskaren K. Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dhaliwal ( CPSO# 90521 )

Business Address:
4 - 456 Vodden Street East
Brampton ON  L6S 5Y7
Phone Number: (905) 497-8155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASKAREN KAUR DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011