Dhaliwal, Inderdeep Singh (CPSO#: 99270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Xavier University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
Divison of Respirology
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: 519-667-6596
Fax: 519-685-8406
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I. S. Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Dhaliwal ( CPSO# 99270 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
Division of Respirology
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 667-6596

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6G 2V4
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INDERDEEP SINGH DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Elective Trainee - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 02 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014