skip to content

Devraj, Amanda Laxmi

CPSO#: 91392

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-9861
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 4164942120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 9054942120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 4164952400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 4162848131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 4164382911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Devraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Devraj ( CPSO# 91392 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: 9054942120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: 4164942120

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: 4164382911

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: 4162848131

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: 4164952400

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMANDA LAXMI DEVRAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVRAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2013