skip to content

Deveau, Joey Steven

CPSO#: 97522

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
1 Bridgepoint Dr
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-8252 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joey Deveau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Deveau ( CPSO# 97522 )

Business Address:
Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:13 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:10 Nov 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOEY STEVEN DEVEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 28 Jun 2013
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2012