skip to content

Dev, Varun Kumar

CPSO#: 95913

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Kidney Care Clinic
200 Church Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Phone: 416-658-2241 Ext. ext 1 or 2
Fax: 416-658-2242 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Varun Dev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dev ( CPSO# 95913 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
200 Church Street
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 658-2241

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VARUN KUMAR DEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015