Detsky, Jay Stephen (CPSO#: 100815)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre, Room T2-187
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416 480 6100 Ext. 7505
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAY STEPHEN DETSKY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DETSKY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. DETSKY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DETSKY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. DETSKY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DETSKY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DETSKY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019