skip to content

Dessouki, Shariff Esmat

CPSO#: 94125

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
711 Concession St
M1-37
Hamilton ON  L8N 1C3
Phone: 905 521 2100 Ext. 43650
Fax: 905 575 2598 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

345 Lakeshore Rd E
Oakville ON  L6J1J5
Canada
Phone: 9058422888
Fax: 9058425316
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

50 Dundurn St S
Unit 114
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3
Canada
Phone: (289) 389-8181
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shariff E. Dessouki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dessouki ( CPSO# 94125 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Suite M1-37
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Orvosi Medical
345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 842-2888


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHARIFF ESMAT DESSOUKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESSOUKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 02 Jul 2010 to 01 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 02 Jul 2011 to 01 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 02 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 02 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 02 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015