skip to content

Desouky, Hesham Mohamed Shafik Ali

CPSO#: 99844

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Feb 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Mansoura University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 4615 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Desouky El-Bohy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. ElBohy ( CPSO# 91245 )
Dr. H. Desouky ( CPSO# 99844 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Aug 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HESHAM MOHAMED SHAFIK ALI DESOUKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESOUKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Feb 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2019