skip to content

Deshpande, Ashish Sharad

CPSO#: 85372

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone: (519) 252-7008
Fax: (519) 252-7002 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

1995 LENS AVE.
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

330 NOTRE DAME STREET
Belle River ON  N0R 1A0
Canada
Phone: (519) 728-0574
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ashish Deshpande Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Deshpande ( CPSO# 85372 )

Business Address:
330 Norte Dame Street
Belle River ON  N0R 1A0
Phone Number: (519) 728-0574

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-1661

Business Address:
Suite 200
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone Number: (519) 252-7008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASHISH SHARAD DESHPANDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESHPANDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 05 Sep 2006
AVP - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 06 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008