skip to content

Desarkar, Pushpal

CPSO#: 96963

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Calcutta, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Adult Neurodevelopmental Services
401 - 1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32726 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Pushpal Desarkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Desarkar ( CPSO# 96963 )

Business Address:
CAMH ANS
Unit 4 Room 401
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:22 Mar 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2019 Active
             Dr. Pushpal Desarkar may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.