skip to content

Desai, Rashmikant Jashbhai

CPSO#: 27892

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 31 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Birmingham, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. J. Desai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 21 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 2433 Presquile Drive Oakville ON L6H 0B8
Date Received: 31 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 2015