skip to content

Desai, Jamsheed A

CPSO#: 86629

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Neurology Consultants
320 - 89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 896-3000
Fax: (905) 896-8906 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jamsheed Desai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Desai ( CPSO# 86629 )

Business Address:
Trillium Neurology Consultants
Suite 320
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 896-3000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMSHEED A DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2014