skip to content

Desai, Dushyant Kapilray

CPSO#: 90264

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Feb 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Kwazulu-Natal, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Centre
Suite 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 741-5252 Ext. 105
Fax: (519) 741-5772 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dushyant Desai and Dr. Jigna Purohit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Desai ( CPSO# 90264 )
Dr. J. Purohit ( CPSO# 90912 )

Business Address:
430 The Boardwalk Suite 206
Waterloo ON  N2T 1C0
Phone Number: 5197415252

Business Address:
Medical Centre
300-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 745-5621

Business Address:
Medical Centre
206-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 579-8889


Corporation Name: Dr, Dushyant Desai and Dr Jigna Purohit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 30 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:11 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DUSHYANT KAPILRAY DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2009