Derynck, Michael Robert (CPSO#: 100659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2019

Expiry Date:  10 May 2019

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Elective as of 15 Apr 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ROBERT DERYNCK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DERYNCK is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. DERYNCK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DERYNCK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. DERYNCK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times: when Dr. DERYNCK is no longer enrolled in the postgraduate medical education program for which the certificate is issued; when Dr. DERYNCK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada); or when fifteen weeks have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 10 May 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 15 Apr 2019 to 10 May 2019
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2019