skip to content

Dermer, Stanley Winston

CPSO#: 25131

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.W. Dermer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 32 Ravine Dr Dundas, ON L9H 6K7
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request to the above address.
Date Received: 19 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018