Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Nov 2007
Summary:
On November 27, 2007, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Derenda committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of O. Reg. 856/93 in that she has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, and under paragraph 1(1)1 of O. Reg. 856/93 in that she has contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration.
The Discipline Committee reserved its decision on penalty. On February 11, 2008, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar revoked Dr. Derenda's certificate of registration, effective immediately.
2. Dr. Derenda pay costs to the College in the amount of $12,215.24 within 90 days of the date of this Order.
3. The results of this proceeding be included on the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 27, 2007
Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 08 Mar 2001
Summary:
On March 8, 2001, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Derenda to be incapacitated and ordered the following:
1. That the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Derenda(s certificate of registration:
(a) Dr. Derenda may not practice unless and until:
(i) Dr. Derenda is monitored by a member holding a certificate of practice in Ontario who is acceptable to the Registrar, which member has executed and is in compliance with an acknowledgement and undertaking in a form agreeable to the Registrar and has delivered such acknowledgement and undertaking to the College within thirty (30) days of the date it is agreed upon by the Registrar. Should any person who has executed an acknowledgement and undertaking for Dr. Derenda pursuant to this order be unable or unwilling to continue under the terms of the acknowledgement and undertaking, Dr. Derenda will provide, within thirty (30) days, a fresh acknowledgement and undertaking from a further person who is satisfactory to the Registrar in a form satisfactory to the Registrar;
(ii) Dr. Derenda obtain a satisfactory result on a peer assessment on a bi-annual basis; and
(iii) Dr. Derenda participate in ongoing psychiatric treatment by a psychiatrist certified by the Royal College as frequently as recommended by the psychiatrist and until such time as the psychiatrist advises the Registrar that such treatment is no longer required.
2. That the Registrar to immediately suspend Dr. Derenda(s certificate of registration in the event that Dr. Derenda fails to comply with any provision of this order, until such time as Dr. Derenda is in compliance with this order.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Mar 2001