skip to content

Derby, Ian Ralph Gaukrodger

CPSO#: 26642

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Feb 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For medical records please email: [email protected]
Date Received: 24 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective:01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020