skip to content

Deol, Mandeep Kaur

CPSO#: 95301

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 May 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arbour Family Medical Centre
281 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 5J5
Phone: (519) 823-5133 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mandeep Deol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Deol ( CPSO# 95301 )

Business Address:
Arbour Family Medical Centre
281 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 5J5
Phone Number: (519) 823-5133

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANDEEP KAUR DEOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEOL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2014