skip to content

Deniz, Stacy Ghislaine

CPSO#: 87064

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone: (905) 634-4440
Fax: (905) 639-3810 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Deniz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Deniz ( CPSO# 87064 )

Business Address:
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone Number: (905) 635-4440

Business Address:
1280 Main Street Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STACY GHISLAINE DENIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENIZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2011 to 25 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

McMaster University, 21 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012