Denis, Rachelle Carolyn (CPSO#: 99322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
315 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke ON  K8A 3K2
Phone: (613) 732-5777
Fax: (613) 735-7305
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHELLE CAROLYN DENIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2015