skip to content

Deneault, Joseph Jocelyn Gilles

CPSO#: 21414

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Montfort Hospital 713 Montreal Rd Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Date Received: 01 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 19 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019