skip to content

Dembo, Justine Sarah

CPSO#: 89824

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry K3W-44
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 6736 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1670 Bayview Ave
Suite 304
Toronto ON  M4G3C2
Canada
Phone: 6477156444
Fax: 8662825176
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUSTINE SARAH DEMBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMBO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2017