skip to content

Demaries, Sandra Lynn

CPSO#: 90021

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1000 Depalma Dr
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: 905-372-6811 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:03 Nov 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANDRA LYNN DEMARIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMARIES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2020