skip to content

Demarco, Carolyn Mary

CPSO#: 25938

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 May 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2017