skip to content

Delport, Johannes Andries

CPSO#: 97348

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education: University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The University of Western Ontario
Schulich School of Medicine
Rix Clinical Skills
Learning Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: (519) 661-2030 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J.A. Delport Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 25 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective:01 Jul 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019 Active
 1.    Dr. Johannes Andries Delport may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pathology
                        and   Laboratory   Medicine,   Division  of  Medical  Microbiology,
                        University  of  Western Ontario, in  which  Dr.  Delport  holds  an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Delport no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.