skip to content

Delorme, Alison Clare Chantry

CPSO#: 98205

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Two Rivers Family Health Team
Unit B10
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 740-5010
Fax: (519) 740-6010 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alison Delorme Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Delorme ( CPSO# 98205 )

Business Address:
Two Rivers Family Health Team
Unit B10
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 740-5010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALISON CLARE CHANTRY DELORME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELORME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014